Mittal, Richa (CPSO#: 76091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Ext. 2152
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richa Mittal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mittal ( CPSO# 76091 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHA MITTAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2006 to 22 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003