Mnatzakanian, Gevork Nshan (CPSO#: 88831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Suite 3-141CC
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5692
Fax: (416) 864-5380
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Gevork Mnatzakanian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Suite 3-141CC
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5692

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEVORK NSHAN MNATZAKANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MNATZAKANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2014