Moatamed, Mohammed Elsanusi (CPSO#: 76880)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 22 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Tahady University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 15, 2008
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES:

On September 16, 2008, Lakeridge Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Mohammed Elsanusi Moatamed's privileges were suspended, effective September 15, 2008.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2004 to 29 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008