Moaveni, Azadeh (CPSO#: 79046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Health Team
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
2nd Floor West Wing, 2W428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5448
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Richmond Hill Cosmetic Clinic
Unit 7
9088 Yonge St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: 289 597 6773
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Forest Hill Family Health
2nd floor
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 416 782 6111
Fax: 416 782 5515
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azadeh Moaveni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moaveni ( CPSO# 79046 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
West Wing 2nd Floor, 2W428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZADEH MOAVENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOAVENI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 22 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005