Moayedi, Yasbanoo (CPSO#: 90606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11th floor 11-PMB 131
585 University Ave
M5G 2C4
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3155 Ext. 6805
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Evan Bunce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Moayedi ( CPSO# 90606 )
Dr. P. Bunce ( CPSO# 83149 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
13EN-216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jan 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASBANOO MOAYEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOAYEDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013