Mobo, Gerson (CPSO#: 97593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone: (416) 463-1500
Fax: (416) 463-6577
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gerson Mobo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mobo ( CPSO# 97593 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone Number: (416) 463-6299

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERSON MOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014