Mocanu, Brindusa Ioana (CPSO#: 91545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Northeast Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237 Ext. 2320
Fax: (705) 523-7329
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brindusa Mocanu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mocanu ( CPSO# 91545 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Northeast Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRINDUSA IOANA MOCANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOCANU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 23 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2014