Mody, Ami Narendra (CPSO#: 80072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 369-0092
Fax: (905) 369-0117
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ami Mody Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mody ( CPSO# 80072 )

Business Address:
204 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 369-0092

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Missouri

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMI NARENDRA MODY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MODY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2004