Moffat, William Wright (CPSO#: 14866)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 29-Feb-2008

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1995