Moffatt, Anne Margaret (CPSO#: 95328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Brock 3
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3359
Fax: 613-544-3559
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Moffatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moffatt ( CPSO# 95328 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Brock 3
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARGARET MOFFATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015