Moffatt, James Ian Riley (CPSO#: 90693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46521
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.I.R. Moffatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moffatt ( CPSO# 90693 )

Business Address:
218 - 1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 572-6868

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (955) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES IAN RILEY MOFFATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014