Moghadam, Soraya (CPSO#: 73782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF H SV Centre-Ottawa
Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 327-9454
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SORAYA MOGHADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOGHADAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 29 Jun 1999 to 26 Jul 1999
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jul 2000 to 30 Jul 2000
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Dec 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003