Mohamed, Adel Abdellatif Awadalla (CPSO#: 88003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2011

Expiry Date:  06 Feb 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Neonatology
600 University Avenue Room 19-231H
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7396
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 07 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 06 Feb 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Adel Abdellatif Awadalla Mohamed may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  Division  of  Neonatology,  University of Toronto, in
                        which  Dr. Mohamed holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of registration will automatically expire on the earlier
                  of the following times:

                  (i)   on February 6, 2020,
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Mohamed  no  longer  holds the academic appointment at the
                        rank  of  Assistant Professor in  the  Department  of  Paediatrics,
                        Division of Neonatology at the University of Toronto, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Mohamed's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.
                  
            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Mohamed's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive  an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  February 7, 2011.   In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 6, 2020.