Mohamed, Ali Mohamed Alaaeldin Labib Ali Labib (CPSO#: 100278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Benha University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
605 Glenridge Ave
Unit # 9
St Catharines ON  L2T 4E6
Phone: (905) 685-8700
Fax: (905) 988-1616
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grantham Medical Clinic
400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 937-0000
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Pelham Walk-In Clinic
245 Pelham Rd
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Canada
Phone: 905 988 1933
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905 378 4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mohamed ( CPSO# 100278)

Business Address:
9-605 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4E6
Phone Number: (905) 685-8700

Business Address:
Operating Room
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Phone Number: (905) 937-0000

Business Address:
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 988-1933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI MOHAMED ALAAELDIN LABIB ALI LABIB MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2015