Mohamed Lamine, Mohamed Hacen (CPSO#: 94875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
640 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Phone: 9052680520
Fax: 9052680521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Lamine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Lamine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Lamine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohamed Lamine ( CPSO# 94875 )

Business Address:
Unit 103
640 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 268-0320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED HACEN MOHAMED LAMINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED LAMINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2015