Mohamed, Roubiya Sameem (CPSO#: 78767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinicare Medical Centre
Unit 3
2250 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1B 2W4
Phone: (416) 293-5454
Fax: (416) 293-7454
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roubiya Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohamed ( CPSO# 78767 )

Business Address:
3 - 2250 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1B 2W4
Phone Number: (416) 293-5454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROUBIYA SAMEEM MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jan 2003 to 05 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jan 2004 to 05 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2004