Mohammed, Javed Ayoub (CPSO#: 86550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nixon Medical Centre
510 Southdale Road East Suite 301
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: (519) 690-2806 Ext. ext 3
Fax: (519) 690-2809
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Javed Mohammed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mohammed ( CPSO# 86550 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 390-2806

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAVED AYOUB MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013