Raja, Mohan Krishnan (CPSO#: 86557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
238 Grand River St N
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohan K. Raja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Raja ( CPSO# 86557 )

Business Address:
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 442-7150

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAN KRISHNAN RAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 May 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 18 Jul 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 2017
Summary:

On November 27, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mohan Krishnan Raja 
committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The allegations arose from the conduct of Dr. Raja during a number of clinical appointments 
when Patient A saw Dr. Raja for methadone treatment.  The Committee found that in at least two 
examinations of Patient A, Dr. Raja had her raise her shirt above her bra, lifted the left side of 
her bra, and exposed her left breast.  He then listened to her heart sounds in four areas, which 
included touching the periphery of her left breast with his stethoscope and pushing aside her 
breast for optimal skin contact.  There was no evidence that Dr. Raja made any comments of a 
sexual nature. 
 
The Committee found that while he did raise Patient A’s bra, there was no evidence that Dr. Raja 
touched her breast in a sexual manner. The Committee noted that there was no fondling, 
massaging of the breast, squeezing, or touching of the nipple.  The Committee accepted that 
listening to the heart sounds in the four areas described by Dr. Raja was an acceptable focused 
cardiac examination.  Examination of the heart in this manner with a stethoscope would involve 
placing the stethoscope close to the breast or at the periphery of the breast.  In some cases, the 
breast would need to be pushed aside for optimal contact between the stethoscope and skin.  The 
Committee found there was no sexual character to the examination as performed in this 
fashion.  While Dr. Raja may have touched her breast while carrying out the examination of her 
heart, such touching of the breast in this context did not constitute a violation of sexual 
integrity.  Dr. Raja’s approach appeared to have a mechanical quality, but was not of a sexual 
character. 
 
In making a finding of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct, the Committee 
considered that: 
 
   •     Dr. Raja failed to respect the privacy owed to his patient; 
   •     The unanticipated exposure of her breast on its own constituted a significant 
         boundary violation; 
   •     Dr. Raja was inconsiderate when he exposed Patient A’s breast; 
   •     Dr. Raja did not understand or disregarded how his actions would make Patient A 
         feel; 
   •     Dr. Raja’s explanation to Patient A of why he needed to repeatedly listen to her heart 
         sounds was unclear or nonexistent; and 
   •     Patient A was a particularly vulnerable patient, which makes a lack of respect for her 
         dignity and privacy more egregious. 
 
In failing to respect his patient’s privacy by not offering appropriate draping and by 
unnecessarily exposing her left breast during examinations, the Committee held that Dr. Raja left 
his patient feeling uncomfortable and scared. She needed to understand why he was examining 
her. His explanations were superficial and left her wondering about his true motive. In his 
manner of examination, he had little regard as to Patient A’s sensitivity or the embarrassment she 
might experience. 
On June 3-4 2016, Dr. Raja attended a one-and-a-half day course on Understanding Boundaries 
and Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship through the Western 
University’s Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry. 
 
On April 20, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that:  
 
-   The Registrar suspend Dr. Raja’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months, 
    to commence at 12:01 a.m. on May 18, 2018. 
-   Dr. Raja appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-   Dr. Raja pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $22,000.00 within 
    thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing: July 10-12, 2017 Penalty Hearing date: April 20, 2018