Mohareb, Michael Moheb (CPSO#: 90844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494 2120 Ext. 30111
Fax: (416) 747 3609
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

6175 Highway 7
Units 19-22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Canada
Phone: (416) 297 8362
Fax: 416 840 8434
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Mohareb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohareb ( CPSO# 90844 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 949-2120

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Suite 19-22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 297-8362

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MOHEB MOHAREB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAREB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013