Moharir, Madhavi Mahendranath (CPSO#: 82792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Richmond Hill Kids Clinic
York Medical Building
Unit 412
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 884-3000
Fax: (905) 884-4821
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Boomerang Health
Unit 211
9401 Jane St
Maple ON  L6A4H7
Canada
Phone: 905-553-3155
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madhavi Moharir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moharir ( CPSO# 82792 )

Business Address:
North Richmond Hill Kids Clinic
York Medical Building
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 412
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 884-3000

Business Address:
Units 19-22
6175 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 297-8362

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
9401 Jane Street
Suite 211
Maple ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 553-3155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADHAVI MAHENDRANATH MOHARIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHARIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2015