Moharir, Mahendranath Dinanath (CPSO#: 81685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Sep 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7721
Fax: (416) 813-6334
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Sep 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mahendranath Dinanath Moharir may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which
                        Dr.  Moharir holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Moharir no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.