Mohindra, Baldev Krishan (CPSO#: 21675)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2011