Mojdami, Fatemeh Dana (CPSO#: 86354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 402
658 Danforth Ave.
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: 416 461 7461
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donna Mojdami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mojdami ( CPSO# 86354 )

Business Address:
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 770-9096

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATEMEH DANA MOJDAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOJDAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011