Mojtabaie, Parmiss (CPSO#: 89048)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016