Mok, Philip Sai-Ho (CPSO#: 95083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue, Room AG-13a
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2268
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Mok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mok ( CPSO# 95083 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room AG-13
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP SAI-HO MOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016