Moledina, Irfan Karim (CPSO#: 93725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
Attn: Dr Moledina
2675 Concession Road
PO Box 2007
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 804-5163
Fax: (613) 216-5163
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irfan Moledina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Moledina ( CPSO# 93725 )

Business Address:
Rideau Crossing Family Health Centre
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-0100

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRFAN KARIM MOLEDINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLEDINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014