Moles, Jonathan Joseph Barrett (CPSO#: 91484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 506
2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 596-6888
Fax: (613) 596-1336
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Moles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moles ( CPSO# 91484 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Unit 506
2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone Number: (613) 596-6888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN JOSEPH BARRETT MOLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014