Molleken, Lynda Louise (CPSO#: 63583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1234 Kingston Road Unit 110
Toronto ON  M1N 1P3
Phone: (647) 812 0495
Fax: 647 498 1200
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7 Eaton South eating disorders
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340 4229
Fax: (416) 340-3430
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lynda Molleken Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Molleken ( CPSO# 63583 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
7 Eaton South
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4229

Business Address:
32 Canadian Forces Health Services Centre
Toronto ON  M3K 0A1

Business Address:
110 - 1234 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1N 1P3
Phone Number: (647) 812-0495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNDA LOUISE MOLLEKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLLEKEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992