Moller, Thomas Friedrich Adolf (CPSO#: 94374)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Christian Alberts University at Kiel, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany
Norway

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 10 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016