Momi, Rajinder Singh (CPSO#: 89282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Department of Psychiatry
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Angeline Street N
2nd Floor
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 3287321
Fax: 7053287318
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

1011 Elgin Street West
Suite 200
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Canada
Phone: 9053779891
Fax: 9053779865
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajinder Momi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Momi ( CPSO# 89282 )

Business Address:
PRHC Hospital Drive Site
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5028

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street
2nd Floor
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-7321

Business Address:
200 - 1011 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone Number: (905) 377-9891

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJINDER SINGH MOMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOMI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010