Moncur, Ross Allan (CPSO#: 91353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Oak LTC
1750 Division St. N
Kingsville ON  N9Y 4G7
Canada
Phone: (519) 733-9303
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Sun Parlor Home
175 Talbot Street East
Leamington ON  N8H 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-5731
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Franklin Gardens LTC home
24 Franklin Rd
Leamington ON  N8H 4B7
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-3289
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot Street W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. A. Moncur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moncur ( CPSO# 91353 )

Business Address:
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1H8
Phone Number: (519) 322-1100

Business Address:
24 Franklin Road
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9

Business Address:
175 Talbot Street East
Leamington ON  N8H 1L9

Business Address:
1750 Division Road North
Kingsville ON  N9Y 4G7

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSS ALLAN MONCUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONCUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011