Mongeon, Guy Jean-Pierre (CPSO#: 71719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Phone: (705) 671-9797
Fax: (705) 671-2992
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Guy Mongeon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mongeon ( CPSO# 71719 )

Business Address:
430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 671-9797

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUY JEAN-PIERRE MONGEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGEON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1999