Monkhouse, Alan Keith (CPSO#: 27097)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017


Corporation Name: Alan K. Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Monkhouse ( CPSO# 27097 )

Business Address:
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Medical Records Location

Address: Grandview Medical Centre 167 Hespeler Road Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Date Received: 03 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018