Monroy Rodriguez, Fanny Rocio (CPSO#: 88865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Bucaramanga, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Catherines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905 378 4647
Fax: 9053040833
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guzman Orduz & Monroy Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Guzman Orduz ( CPSO# 82169 )
Dr. F. Monroy Rodriguez ( CPSO# 88865 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FANNY ROCIO MONROY RODRIGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONROY RODRIGUEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014