Montour, Amy Angela (CPSO#: 95435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
492 Cayuga Rd.
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone: 9055374367
Fax: 9057683445
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brant Community Healthcare System
200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Montour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Montour ( CPSO# 95435 )

Business Address:
492 Cayuga Road
R.R. #6
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (289) 339-4132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY ANGELA MONTOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)