Moodley, Prabashnee (CPSO#: 92351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alton Village Medical Clinic
Unit 104
4903 Thomas Alton Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7M 0W8
Phone: (905) 319-9299
Fax: (905) 319-9230
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Moodley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moodley ( CPSO# 92351 )

Business Address:
Alton Village Medical Clinic
4903 Thomas Alton Boulevard
Unit 104
Burlington ON  L7M 0W8
Phone Number: (905) 319-9299

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRABASHNEE MOODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2012