Moodley, Preveshen (CPSO#: 93363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 125A - 1984 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S1
Phone: (705) 222-1984
Fax: (705) 805-0825
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PREVESHEN MOODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016