Mookadam, Farouk (CPSO#: 56359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mayo Clinic Scottsdale
Mayo Building Concourse Cardiology
Cardiovascular Diseases NonInvasive
13400 East Shea Boulevard
Scottsdale AZ  85259
United States
Phone: (480) 301-6801
Fax: 480 301 8018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Minnesota
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAROUK MOOKADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOKADAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2013