Moolman, Andre (CPSO#: 78981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, Dutch, English, German

Education:University of Pretoria, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 5489
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener
Ontario
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2175
Fax: (519) 749-4325
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6578
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Freeport Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A2W1
Canada
Phone: 5197494300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moolman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moolman ( CPSO# 78981 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W6
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE MOOLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOLMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2006 to 24 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2003