Moore, Corey Curtis (CPSO#: 70430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street 2nd Floor
London, Ontario
N6A 4V2
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6383
Fax: (519) 646-6173
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

444 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2P2
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-8500
Fax: (519) 433-8599
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Corey Curtis Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moore ( CPSO# 70430 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Suite B2-501
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6383

Business Address:
Woodfield Surgical Centre
444 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 433-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COREY CURTIS MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2001