Moore, Gregory Paul (CPSO#: 77558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 806
Division of Newborn Care
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8561
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory P. Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moore ( CPSO# 77558 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 806
Division of Newborn Care
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8909

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2007