Moore, Lisa Jane (CPSO#: 61063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Court Medical Clinic
Unit 5
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Fax: (613) 739-7043
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa J Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA JANE MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1991