Moores, Carl David (CPSO#: 92339)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 2010 to 12 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2012