Moores, Daisy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 88930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 17
99 Fifth Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5K4
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daisy Moores Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Moores ( CPSO# 88930 )

Business Address:
Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
99 Fifth Avenue
Suite 17
Ottawa ON  K1S 5K4
Phone Number: (613) 563-3670

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAISY ELIZABETH MOORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011