Morais, Michelle Lynn (CPSO#: 84471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Obstetrics & Gynecology Department
1280 Main Street West HSC 4D9
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76210
Fax: (905) 527-2675
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Morais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Morais ( CPSO# 84471 )

Business Address:
HSC 4D9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LYNN MORAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 06 Aug 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2013