Morant, Kareem (CPSO#: 93668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CORCARE
325 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Morant ( CPSO# 93668 )
Dr. E. Fraser ( CPSO# 93191 )

Business Address:
Corcare
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREEM MORANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014