Moreau, Natalie Anna Marie (CPSO#: 91083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natalie Moreau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Moreau ( CPSO# 91083 )

Business Address:
Greenbelt Family Health Team
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE ANNA MARIE MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011