Morel, Chantal France Joelle (CPSO#: 80624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN MSH Fred A Litwin Family Centre
in Genetic Medicine
3rd Floor Room 400 Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4220
Fax: (416) 619-5523
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantal Morel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morel ( CPSO# 80624 )

Business Address:
UHN MSH Fred A Litwin Family Center
in Genetic Medicine
3rd Floor Room 400 Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTAL FRANCE JOELLE MOREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2004 to 30 May 2004
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2007