Morel, Joyce (CPSO#: 72458)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2014