Morency, Anne-Maude (CPSO#: 94960)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2011 to 08 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 8 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2015